EP1111701 - Non-sintered nickel electrode for secondary battery with alkali electrolyte [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saft Finance S.à.r.l. 398, route d'Esch 1471 Luxembourg / LU | [2005/17] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Patrick 6, Cours de Gourge 33000 Bordeaux / FR | 02 /
Senyarich, Stéphane La Brouterie 16600 Mornac / FR | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Pochart, François, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Pochart, François, et al Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 30, Aavenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | Laroche, Danièle, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403387.4 | 04.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FR19990016336 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916336 | [2001/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111701 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/52, H01M4/32 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H01M4/32 (EP,US);
H01M4/52 (EP,US);
H01M4/621 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nicht gesinterete Nickelelektrode für Sekundärbatterie mit alkalischem Elektrolyt | [2001/26] | English: | Non-sintered nickel electrode for secondary battery with alkali electrolyte | [2001/26] | French: | Electrode au nickel non fritée pour générateur électrochimique secondaire à électrolyte alcalin | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02262245 ; | [A]JPH06196161 ; | [A]JPH10334911 ; | [A]JPH10214622 ; | [A]EP0468942 (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF [CA]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0930663 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 15-20 * paragraph [0036] * * claims 1,2,4,6,18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910109), vol. 015, no. 009, Database accession no. (E - 1021), & JP02262245 A 19901025 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1,10-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941014), vol. 018, no. 540, Database accession no. (E - 1616), & JP06196161 A 19940715 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,10-12,21-29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10334911 A 19981218 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10214622 A 19980811 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |