EP1112977 - Process for cooling an optical fibre during drawing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draka Comteq B.V. De Boelelaan 7 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Draka comteq B.V. De Boelelaan 7 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Draka Comteq B.V. Rhijnspoorplein 22 1018 TX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guenot, Philippe 11, Avenue Eugène Adam 78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | 02 /
Nicolardot, Marc 68, rue Victor Hugo 95480 Pierrelaye / FR | 03 /
Bourhis, Jean-François 19, Route de Bethemont 95150 Taverny / FR | 04 /
Lainet, Eric 15, rue des Graviers 78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Blokland, Arie Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Blokland, Arie Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau, P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/38] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/27] | Laroche, Danièle, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403390.8 | 04.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | FR19990016724 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916724 | [2001/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112977 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112977 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/027, C03B37/023, B29D11/00 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
C03B37/0235 (EP,US);
B29D11/00721 (EP,US);
C03B37/02718 (EP,US);
C03B2205/55 (EP,US);
C03B2205/56 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kühlen einer optischen Faser während des Ziehens | [2001/27] | English: | Process for cooling an optical fibre during drawing | [2001/27] | French: | Procédé de refroidissement d'une fibre optique en cours de fibrage | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2003 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | ES | 17.10.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | LU | 04.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
LU | 04.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
ES | 17.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 06.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0656456 ; | [A]JPH09142890 ; | [A]JPH1067531 ; | [A]JPH10259036 ; | [A]JPH0977527 ; | [A]JPS589836 ; | [A]EP0887319 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]US5928574 (DIMARCELLO FRANK VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940602), vol. 18, no. 288, & JP06056456 A 19940301 (FUJIKURA LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 32, Database accession no. 97-347231, XP002144228 & JPH09142890 A 19970603 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 8, & JP10067531 A 19980310 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10259036 A 19980929 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 7, & JP09077527 A 19970325 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830330), vol. 7, no. 77, & JP58009836 A 19830120 (SHOWA DENSEN ELECTRIC WIRE CO. LTD.) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |