EP1113390 - Image-processing method and recording medium in which such an image-processing method is recorded [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken 640-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eiho, Shigeru Graduate School of Informatics, Kyoto University Gokasho Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0011 / KP | 02 /
Nitta, Kuraji Noritsu Koki co., Ltd., 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8550 / JP | 03 /
Dedachi, Shoichi Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd., 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8550 / JP | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Rémont, Claude, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Rémont, Claude, et al NOVAMARK TECHNOLOGIES, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403671.1 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | JP19990370938 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37093899 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113390 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113390 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/20 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
G06T5/75 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/27] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungverfahren und Aufnahmeträger mit darauf gespeichertem Bildverarbeitungsprogramm | [2001/27] | English: | Image-processing method and recording medium in which such an image-processing method is recorded | [2001/27] | French: | Méthode de traitement d'image et support d'enregistrement sur lequel est enregistré un programme de traitement d'image | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.03.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP07150281.9 / EP1903501 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4571635 (MAHMOODI A B [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,14-16,18 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]US4794531 (MORISHITA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 6-9,19-22 * column 3, line 35 - line 53 * * column 5, line 9 - line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US5880767 (LIU SAMSON J [US]) [X] 10,12,13,23,25,26 * column 1, line 40 - line 43 * * column 3, line 33 - line 62 * * column 4, line 47 - line 58 * * column 5, line 47 - line 56 * * column 6, line 1 - line 25 * * figure 8 * [A] 11,24; | [EA]EP1073014 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [E] 6,7,19,20 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 5, line 15 - line 30 * [A] 8,9,21,22; | [XA] - POLESEL A ET AL, "Adaptive unsharp masking for contrast enhancement", 1997. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 26-29 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971026), ISBN 0-8186-8183-7, pages 267 - 270, XP010254160 [X] 1-3,5,14-16,18 * page 267-268, section "2.The Algorithm"* * page 267, equation 1 * * page 268, equations 8-14 * [A] 4,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1997.647756 | [X] - R.C. GONZALEZ, R. E. WOODS, Digital Image Processing, NEW YORK, ADDSISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1992), XP002247092 [X] 1,14 * page 195 - page 197; figures 4.24,4.26 * * equations 4.3-3, 4.3-4 * | [Y] - KONDO H ET AL, "ONE APPROACH FOR IMAGE EDGE SHARPENING", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION AND SYSTEMS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19960501), vol. E79-D, no. 5, ISSN 0916-8532, pages 620 - 624, XP000593281 [Y] 1-3,5,14-16,18 * page 620-622, subsection 2.2 "Edge Sharpening" * * page 622, equation 2 * | [A] - JACKSON P H ET AL, "CHEST RADIOGRAPH ENHANCEMENT USING THE WEIGHTED UNSHARP MASK", PROCEEDINGS OF ISMII. IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MEDICAL IMAGING AND IMAGE INTERPRETATION, XX, (1982), pages 10 - 13, XP001051326 [A] 6-9,19-22 * page 10, right column - page 11 left column * | [XA] - SCOGNAMIGLIO G ET AL, "PICTURE ENHANCEMENT IN VIDEO AND BLOCK-CODED IMAGE SEQUENCES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199908), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 680 - 689, XP000926984 [X] 10,12,13,23,25,26 * page 681, left culumn, second paragraph - right column second paragraph * * page 682, right column last paragraph - page 683, left colum, first paragraph * [A] 11,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.793569 | [A] - SHAN T-J, "A NOVEL DIGITAL UNSHARP MASKING ALGORITHM FOR COLOR IMAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19920721), vol. 1771, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 41 - 46, XP008019410 [A] 5,9,13,18,22,26 * page 43 * * page 45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.139080 | Examination | - HABERCCKER P., Digitale Bildverarbeitung - Grundlagen und Anwendungen, MÜNCHEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (1985), XP001152494 |