EP1118556 - Automatic dispensing system for articles for commissioning one or several orders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Nationale d'Exploitation Industrielle des Tabacs et Allumettes S.E.I.T.A. 53 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Société Nationale D'Exploitation Industrielle Des Tabacs et Allumettes S.E.I.T.A. 53, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gouy, Jean-Claude 11, rue Camille de Neuville 69009 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Guyard, Jean-Arnaud 16, rue Benjamin-Franklin 78000 Versailles / FR | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00403715.6 | 29.12.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | FR20000000783 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0000783 | [2001/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118556 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118556 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B65G1/1376 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/16] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Automatisches Verteilsystem für Gegenstände zum Kommissionieren einer oder mehrerer Bestellunguen | [2002/09] | English: | Automatic dispensing system for articles for commissioning one or several orders | [2001/30] | French: | Système de distribution automatique d'articles pour la préparation d'une ou plusieurs commandes de tels articles | [2001/30] |
Former [2001/30] | Automatisches Verteilsystem für Gegenstände zum Kommissionieren ein oder mehrere Bestellungen | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 27.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Request for further processing for: | 08.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 19.03.2003 | GB | 19.03.2003 | GR | 19.03.2003 | IE | 19.03.2003 | TR | 19.03.2003 | DK | 19.06.2003 | SE | 19.06.2003 | PT | 20.06.2003 | [2006/51] |
Former [2004/23] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GB | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
DK | 19.06.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GB | 19.03.2003 | ||
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
IE | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
PT | 20.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
SE | 19.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 19.03.2003 | |
GR | 19.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 19.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8907478U (WILTSCHE) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5271703 (LINDQVIST PER-ERIK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]FR2696722 (MDE [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | WO9723394 | EP0816267 |