EP1048572 - Method and machine for heat shrinking a thermoplastic sleeve around a palletized load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/44] | Method and machine for heatshrinking a thermoplastic sleeve around a palletized load | ||
[2003/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thimon Savoie Hexapôle Rue Louis Armand 73420 Méry / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Thimon Savoie Hexapole rue Louis Armand 73420 Méry / FR | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Société Thimon Boulevard Lepic 73100 Aix-les-Bains / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin Cocher, Jean-Paul Charles 509, rue Auguste Renoir 73290 La Motte Servolex / FR | 02 /
Jaconelli, Georges 22, chemin des Gros Brison St.-Innocent, 73100 Aix-les-Bains / FR | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Hecké, Gérard Cabinet HECKE World Trade Center - Europole, 5, Place Robert Schuman, BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00410042.6 | 26.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | FR19990005414 | 26.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9905414 | [2000/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048572 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048572 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B53/06 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B65B53/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, NL [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum heissschrumpfen einer thermoplastischen Hülle um eine palettisierte Ladung | [2003/26] | English: | Method and machine for heat shrinking a thermoplastic sleeve around a palletized load | [2003/26] | French: | Procédé et machine pour thermorétracter une gaine thermoplastique sur une charge palettisée | [2000/44] |
Former [2000/44] | Verfahren und vorrichtung zum heissschrumpfen einer thermoplastischen hülle um eine palettisierte ladung | ||
Former [2000/44] | Method and machine for heatshrinking a thermoplastic sleeve around a palletized load | Examination procedure | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 19.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/18] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 03.03.2004 | |
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | ES | 14.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2564033 (THIMON STE NOUVELLE EXPLOIT [FR]) [DA] 1,3 * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 17; figure - *; | [A]DE3834519 (BEUMER MASCHF BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 52; figure - *; | [A]DE8513892U (MSK-VERPACKUNGSSYSTEME) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 2 - line 19; figure - * | by applicant | FR2564033 | FR2082861 |