EP1058455 - Image sequence decoder for rapid avance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Bossche, Nadia Les Balcons du Touvet, Bât. 2 38660 le Touvet / FR | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2000/49] | Application number, filing date | 00410054.1 | 26.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | FR19990006916 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9906916 | [2000/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058455 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/85, H04N9/804 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
H04N5/783 (EP);
H04N5/85 (EP);
H04N9/8042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildsequenzdekodierer für schnellen Vorlauf | [2000/49] | English: | Image sequence decoder for rapid avance | [2000/49] | French: | Décodeur de sequence d'image pour advance rapide | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 28.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0866461 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0887799 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |