EP1049115 - Method and device for demagnetizing pieces of small thickness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walker Braillon Magnetics 480, avenue Léonard de Vinci 73800 Sainte Helene du Lac / FR | [2001/16] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Braillon Magnetique Parc d'activites de la Grande Ile, Sainte Hélène du Lac 73800 Montmelian / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doyelle, M. Pierre Moretel 73800 Montmelian / FR | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2000/44] | Bratel, Gérard Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00420062.2 | 31.03.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | FR19990005572 | 28.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9905572 | [2000/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049115 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01F13/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
H01F13/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 02.05.2001 | LT | 02.05.2001 | LV | 02.05.2001 | MK | 02.05.2001 | RO | 02.05.2001 | SI | 02.05.2001 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entmagnetisierung dünner Produkte | [2000/44] | English: | Method and device for demagnetizing pieces of small thickness | [2000/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la démagnétisation de produits de faible épaisseur | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0834890 (BRAILLON MAGNETIQUE [FR]) [DY] 1-5 * abstract *; | [DY]DE8702843U (VALLON GMBH) [DY] 1-5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9508177 (KNOGO CORP [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * |