EP1048559 - Wheeled toy for child [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groupe Berchet 31 Cours de Verdun 01100 Oyonnax / FR | [2001/23] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Etablissements Maurice Charton 2 Place de la Libération 39150 Saint Laurent en Grandvaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pauly, Gilbert Grande rue 39130 Blye / FR | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00420084.6 | 27.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | FR19990005576 | 28.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9905576 | [2000/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048559 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62K9/00, B62K13/00, B62J9/00, B62H7/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B62H7/00 (EP,US);
B62J9/27 (EP,US);
B62K13/00 (EP);
B62K9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | Spielzeug mit Rädern fürs Kind | [2000/44] | English: | Wheeled toy for child | [2000/44] | French: | Jouet à roues pour enfant | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 16.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/50] | Request for further processing for: | 04.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5487554 (MAY WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 15 - line 35; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [A]US4917398 (DE MIRANDA PINTO PAULO S [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 5 - line 25; figures 5,6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5702038 (MILLER JUDITH A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3,6; claim 1 *; | [AD]FR2703972 (CHARTON ETS MAURICE [FR]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH09109971 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09109971 A 19970428 (MIZUTANI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2703972 |