EP1061225 - A swinging door opening and closing device with a security and locking/unlocking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ets DOITRAND FRERES S.A. Grézolles 42260 Saint Germain Laval / FR | For all designated states Doitrand Service (Sarl) 42260 Grezolles / FR | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doitrand, Roland Le Grand Vernay 42260 Saint Germain Laval / FR | 02 /
Durand, Philippe 42430 Saint Marcel d'Urfe / FR | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2000/51] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville 42000 St.Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00420123.2 | 09.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | FR19990007694 | 14.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907694 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061225 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
E05F15/63 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP);
E05Y2600/41 (EP);
E05Y2600/45 (EP);
E05Y2800/358 (EP);
E05Y2900/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/36] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eine mit einem Verriegelungs-und Entriegelungsmechanismus ausgebildeten Öffnungs-und Schliesseinrichtung für Drehtore | [2000/51] | English: | A swinging door opening and closing device with a security and locking/unlocking mechanism | [2000/51] | French: | Mécanisme de sécurité et de verrouillage/déverrouillage associé à un dispositif d'ouverture/fermeture de portail à battants | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1070526 (HÜGLE) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 15 - line 29 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5549012 (READ JOHN C [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2582666 (YOUNG CHARLES E) [A] 1 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 40; figures 1-6 * |