EP1067324 - Quick-connect coupling for composite tubing with metallic core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comap Abbeville S.A. 213 Boulevard Voltaire 80100 Abbeville / FR | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leger, Jacky M. 14 rue de Lorraine 80132 Neuilly L'Hopital / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00420150.5 | 05.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | FR19990009121 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909121 | [2001/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067324 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067324 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/26 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
F16L37/091 (EP);
F16L33/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Schnellkupplung für Verbundrohr mit metallischem Kern | [2001/02] | English: | Quick-connect coupling for composite tubing with metallic core | [2001/02] | French: | Raccord instantané pour tube composite à âme métallique | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 22.06.2005 | IE | 22.06.2005 | CY | 05.07.2005 | LU | 05.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 22.09.2005 | SE | 22.09.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CY | 05.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 22.08.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
DK | 22.09.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
IE | 22.06.2005 | ||
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 22.06.2005 | |
SE | 22.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 22.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5090741 (YOKOMATSU TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 6, lines 50-59 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29711313U (HENCO IND NV [BE]) [A] 1,5 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 19 * * figure . *; | [A]DE19702289 (OVENTROP SOHN KG F W [DE]) [A] 1,5-8 * column 1, lines 17-29 * * column 1, lines 40-57 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 43 ** figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0879985 (JAEGGI GEORG [AT]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, lines 20-27 * * column 3, lines 3-55 * * figure . * | by applicant | DE3322202 | EP0611911 |