EP1111106 - Rotary dobby for weaving looms and loom with such a dobby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STÄUBLI FAVERGES Place Robert Stäubli 74210 Faverges / FR | [2002/43] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states STAUBLI FAVERGES Place Robert Staubli 74210 Faverges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palau, Joseph 772 Route de Sales 74410 Saint-Jorioz / FR | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00420257.8 | 12.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | FR19990015776 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9915776 | [2001/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111106 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111106 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D03C1/00, F16D11/16 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
D03C1/00 (EP);
F16D11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rotationsschaftmaschine für Webmaschinen und Webmaschine mit einer solchen Schaftmaschine | [2001/26] | English: | Rotary dobby for weaving looms and loom with such a dobby | [2001/26] | French: | Ratiére rotative pour métier à tisser et métier à tisser équipé d'une telle ratière | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2002 | FI | 23.10.2002 | GB | 23.10.2002 | GR | 23.10.2002 | IE | 23.10.2002 | NL | 23.10.2002 | TR | 23.10.2002 | LU | 12.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | DK | 23.01.2003 | PT | 23.01.2003 | SE | 23.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | MC | 01.07.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
TR | 23.10.2002 | ||
LU | 12.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
LU | 12.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
LU | 12.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
FI | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 23.10.2002 | |
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 23.01.2003 | |
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 23.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2909131 (JOHANN KAISER GMBH & CO KG MAS) [A] 1,5,7,8 * figure - *; | [AD]FR2540524 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR]) [AD] 1,5,8 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0185780 (STAEUBLI AG [CH]) [AD] 1,5,7 * figure - *; | [A]EP0607632 (BURIGANA LUCIO [IT]) [A] 1,5,7,8* figure - *; | [AD]FR2757882 (STAUBLI SA ETS [FR]) [AD] 1,5,8 * figure - * |