EP1069544 - Method to control the position of a mobile phone user and the network access server to carry out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hägebarth, Frank Heuchelbergstrasse 3 74366 Kirchheim / DE | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Giebel-Roder, Marion, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Giebel-Roder, Marion, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00440193.1 | 30.06.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | DE1999132737 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932737 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069544 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069544 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0968 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
H04W8/10 (EP,US);
G08G1/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/0407 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Positionsüberwachung eines Mobilfunkteilnehmers sowie Netzwerkszugangsserver zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2004/03] | English: | Method to control the position of a mobile phone user and the network access server to carry out the method | [2001/03] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de la position d'un possesseur d'un téléphone portable ainsi que le fournisseur d'accès au réseau pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [2001/03] |
Former [2001/03] | Verfahren zur Positionsüberwachung eines Mobilfunkteilnehmers sowie Netzwerkszugangsserver zurDurchführung des Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 24.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 11.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.05.2004 | FI | 26.05.2004 | IE | 26.05.2004 | NL | 26.05.2004 | AT | 30.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | LU | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | DK | 26.08.2004 | GR | 26.08.2004 | SE | 26.08.2004 | PT | 26.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 26.05.2004 | |
FI | 26.05.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
AT | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
NL | 26.05.2004 | ||
AT | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
AT | 30.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
LU | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
IE | 26.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 26.08.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
GR | 26.08.2004 | ||
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 26.05.2004 | |
SE | 26.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 26.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10260047 ; | [A]JPH1185011 ; | [A]JPH10103986 ; | [A]JPH1038591 ; | [A]JPH09319303 ; | [XA]FR2761837 (SOMMELET SOPHIE [FR]) [X] 1,7 * figure 1 * [A] 2-6,8-10; | [X]DE19824587 (HUBER MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0887782 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 4, line 26 - line 52 * [A] 2-6,8-10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10260047 A 19980929 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11085011 A 19990330 (DENSO CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10103986 A 19980424 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10038591 A 19980213 (NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09319303 A 19971212 (NEC HOME ELECTRON LTD) [A] 2 * abstract * |