EP1067002 - Parallel-shaft transmission for vehicles with hybrid propulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA 62 Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA 62 Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petiot, Jean-Paul 42, Route d'Orsay 91460 Marcoussis / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Le Faou, Daniel Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K 35769 Saint-Gregoire Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Le Faou, Daniel Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K 35769 Saint-Gregoire Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/02] | Le Faou, Daniel Cabinet Regimbeau, 11, rue Franz Heller, Centre d'Affaires Patton, CS 50605 35706 Rennes Cédex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00460040.9 | 03.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | FR19990009028 | 06.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909028 | [2001/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067002 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067002 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/02 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B60K6/36 (EP);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/547 (EP);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60K2006/4808 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Parallelwellengetriebe für Fahrzeuge mit Hybridantrieb | [2001/02] | English: | Parallel-shaft transmission for vehicles with hybrid propulsion | [2001/02] | French: | Boîte de vitesses mécanique en ligne, pour véhicule à propulsion hybride | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | GB | 28.05.2003 | IE | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | CY | 03.07.2003 | LU | 03.07.2003 | BE | 31.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | DE | 29.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 03.07.2003 | ||
LU | 03.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
MC | 31.07.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 03.07.2003 | ||
LU | 03.07.2003 | ||
BE | 31.07.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 03.07.2003 | ||
LU | 03.07.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 03.07.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GB | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
IE | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 28.05.2003 | |
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10217779 ; | [A]DE3230121 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5603242 (KRIEGER JEFFREY J [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10217779 A 19980818 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | GB993185 | FR2699127 | EP0845618 |