EP1103485 - Flexible packages with opening device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/22] | Device for manually opening flexible packages | ||
[2004/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unex Aparellaje Electrico S.L. Rafael Campalans 15-21 08903 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | [2005/36] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states APARELLAJE ELECTRICO, S.A. Rafael Campalans 15-17 E-08903 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benito Navazo, Juan Manuel Caldes 35 08190 Sant Cugat Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al CURELL SUÑOL S.L.P. Passeig de Gràcia 65 bis 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Curell Aguilà, Marcelino, et al Dr. Ing. M. Curell Sunol I.I. S.L. Agentes de la Propiedad Industrial Passeig de Gracia, 65 bis E-08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 00500228.2 | 08.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | ES19990002951U | 23.11.1999 Original published format: ES 9902951 U | [2001/22] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1103485 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1103485 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1103485 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
B65D75/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/29] |
Former [2005/01] | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flexibler Behälter mit Öffnungsvorrichtung | [2004/13] | English: | Flexible packages with opening device | [2004/13] | French: | Récipient flexible avec dispositif d'ouverture | [2004/13] |
Former [2001/22] | Vorrichtung zur manuellen Öffnung flexibler Behälter | ||
Former [2001/22] | Device for manually opening flexible packages | ||
Former [2001/22] | Dispositif d'ouverture manuelle de récipients flexibles | Examination procedure | 16.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 04.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/09] | FI | 26.01.2005 | |
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | DK | 26.04.2005 | |
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | DK | 26.04.2005 | |
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | SE | 26.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1399493 (YAMAMOTO, H.) [Y] 1,8-10 * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column R, paragraph 2 - page 3, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US3759439 (CROSS W, et al) [Y] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 7 - line 18 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB2168680 (BUNTING PETER ERIC, et al) [A] 2 * page 3, line 63 - line 67 * * figure . *; | [A]WO9935048 (TECKSOM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED [BS], et al) [A] 4* claim 3 * |