EP1121005 - Metal component carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Axelsson, Christian Lastageplatsen 1A 291 53 Kristianstad / SE | 02 /
Renmark, Ulrika Allévägen 10B 240 32 Flyinge / SE | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2001/31] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Hofman-Bang A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 00610009.3 | 25.01.2000 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121005 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/30, H05K3/34 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
H05K3/301 (EP,US);
H05K3/341 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10772 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | 28.01.2000 | LT | 28.01.2000 | LV | 28.01.2000 | MK | 28.01.2000 | RO | 28.01.2000 | SI | 28.01.2000 | Title | German: | Metallträger für Bauteil | [2001/31] | English: | Metal component carrier | [2001/31] | French: | Support de composant en métal | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 14.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4332770 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11307997 ; | [A]US4629278 (NORTON JEFFREY M [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US5272597 (STAPLES ALFRED G [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure - *; | [A]JPH07240654 ; | [A]EP0739675 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US5865413 (NIEMANN PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [DA]US4663695 (OHKAWARA EIJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4273399 (MYERS RONALD W, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11307997 A 19991105 (FUJITSU) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP07240654 A 19950912 (NIPPON DEMPA KOGYO CO) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |