EP1102200 - Automated collection and analysis patient care system and method for ordering and prioritizing multiple health disorders to identify an index disorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Intelligence Corporation 2518 Constance Drive West Seattle Washington 98199-3017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Cardiac Intelligence Corporation 2518 Constance Drive West Seattle, Washington 98199-3017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bardy, Gust H. 2518 Constance Drive West Seattle, Washington 98199-3017 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Loer Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00650198.5 | 16.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | US19990441405 | 16.11.1999 Original published format: US 441405 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1102200 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1102200 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
A61N1/37282 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H40/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/21] | Title | German: | Automatisiertes Sammlungs und Analyse- Patienten ,Pflegesystem und Verfahren zum Ordnen und setzen von Prioritäten für ein Vielfach von Krankheiten zum Identifizieren einer Indexkrankheit | [2001/21] | English: | Automated collection and analysis patient care system and method for ordering and prioritizing multiple health disorders to identify an index disorder | [2001/21] | French: | Système de gestion de soins aux patients avec collection et analyse automatique et méthode d'ordonnancement et d'établissement de priorités dans un multiple de maladies pour identifier une maladie index | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/02] | 13.06.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.09.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/02] | Appeal following examination | 23.08.2007 | Appeal received No. T1814/07 | 22.10.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 02.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP08163387.7 / EP2015211 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0531889 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,15 * column 2, line 50 - column 12, line 46; figures 1-14 * [A] 2-14,16-30; | [YA]WO9946718 (HEALTHWARE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,15 * page 4, line 15 - page 9, line 30 * [A] 2-14,16-30; | [A]US5660183 (CHIANG CHIH-MING J [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 3 - column 6, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5331549 (CRAWFORD JR JOHN M [US]) [A] 115 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 32 - column 9, line 26; figures 1-7 * | [A] - LONG W J ET AL, "Differential diagnosis generation from a causal network with probabilities", COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY, 1988. PROCEEDINGS. WASHINGTON, DC, USA 25-28 SEPT. 1988, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19880925), ISBN 0-8186-1949-X, pages 185 - 188, XP010016322 [A] 1,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5113869 | US19990324894 | US19990361332 | US19990361777 |