EP1033213 - Assembly and method for generating a compacting movement in a concrete product casting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valkeakoski X-Tec Oy Ltd. Sammonkatu 10 37600 Valkeakoski / FI | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ojanen, Paavo Väinöntie 13 37680 Valkeakoski / FI | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Hovi, Simo Pekka Tapani, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Hovi, Simo, et al Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00660038.1 | 01.03.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | FI19990000451 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: FI 990451 | [2000/36] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033213 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033213 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/22, B28B1/08, B30B1/26 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B28B1/084 (EP);
B28B3/228 (EP);
B30B1/266 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | B28B3/22, B28B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer verdichtender Bewegung in einem Gleitfertiger zum Herstellen von Betongegenständen | [2000/36] | English: | Assembly and method for generating a compacting movement in a concrete product casting machine | [2000/36] | French: | Assemblage et méthode pour générer un mouvement de compactage dans un dispositif de moulage de produit en béton | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4434646 (MAEDA NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [YD]EP0677362 (VALKEAKOSKI EXTEC OY LTD [FI]) [YD] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]FR1369083 (MAY PRESSENBAU GMBH) [A] 1,2,11 * figures 5-12 *; | [A]EP0846534 (PARTEK CONCRETE DEV OY AB [FI]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0235114 (KT SUUNNITTELU OY [FI]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]US4674971 (KANKKUNEN HEIKKI I [FI]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0541963 (LOHJA PARMA ENG LPE [FI]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * |