EP1081776 - Method and arrangement for anticipating disengagement moment of battery package of battery-operated electronic device, and battery-operated electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laitinen, Timo Peiponkatu 6 37830 Viiala / FI | 02 /
Laine, Merja Pomeranssinkatu 5 33710 Tampere / FI | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00660146.2 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | FI19990001860 | 01.09.1999 Original published format: FI 991860 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081776 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081776 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/34, H01M2/10 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H01M6/5044 (EP,US);
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
H01M50/202 (EP,US);
H01M50/262 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/06] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorhersage des Herausnehmmoments eines Batteriepacks aus batteriebetriebenen elektronischen Geräten, und elektronisches Gerät | [2001/10] | English: | Method and arrangement for anticipating disengagement moment of battery package of battery-operated electronic device, and battery-operated electronic device | [2001/10] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour anticiper le moment de désengagement d'un bloc de batteries d'un dispositif électronique, et dispositif électronique | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5248570 (MEIER HANS A [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US5294496 (SATO YASUHARU [JP]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9712414 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [DA] 1-26 * page 4, line 1 - page 3, line 35 ** figures 1-4 * |