EP1089400 - Connector with primary molded member and secondary molded member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sako, Takaharu, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Murakami, Fumiaki, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Kamiya, Yoshitaka, c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00710023.3 | 28.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990279097 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27909799 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089400 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1089400 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089400 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/24 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01R43/24 (EP);
H01R13/405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbinder mit einem ersten und einem zweiten Formteil | [2001/14] | English: | Connector with primary molded member and secondary molded member | [2001/14] | French: | Connecteur avec une première et une deuxième pièce moulée | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 23.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5580001 (ROMANN PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 13 *; | [A]US5427319 (BATA GEORGE T [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 61 *; | [A]EP0015128 (AUTOMATION IND INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, line 16 - page 13, line 2 *; | [A]FR2741832 (BOST GARNACHE IND [FR]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 3 - line 9 * | Examination | JPS6170016U |