EP1093122 - System for signal processing and signal transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD. 3-12 Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama 221-0022 / JP | [2008/19] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Victor Company of Japan, Ltd. 3-12 Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama 221-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoshiaki 1-12-23, Kugenuma Sakuragaoka Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Shoji 955-4, Takakura Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/51] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00710024.1 | 28.09.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | JP19990279708 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27970899 | JP20000097413 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000097413 | JP19990275963 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27596399 | JP19990275964 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27596499 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093122 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093122 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093122 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H04L12/40058 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/0071 (EP,US);
G11B20/00768 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04L12/40071 (EP,US);
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2220/211 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/16] | G11B20/12, G11B20/10, H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/49] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Signalverarbeitung und Signalübertragung | [2001/16] | English: | System for signal processing and signal transmission | [2001/16] | French: | Système de traitement de signal et de transmission de signal | [2007/47] |
Former [2001/16] | Système de traitement du signal et de transmission de signal | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0899964 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0166] ** figures 10-14 *; | [E]EP1045390 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1087557 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 9-13 *; | [E]EP1104966 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document * |