EP1130250 - High pressure fuel injection pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä NSD Schweiz AG Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grote, Norbert Guggenbühlstrasse 22 8404 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Hofer, Robert Schützenhausstrasse 15 8353 Elgg / CH | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2001/36] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810170.1 | 01.03.2000 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130250 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/24, F02M59/26, F02M59/34, F02M63/00, F02M59/44 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
F02M59/265 (EP);
F02M59/442 (EP);
F02M63/0001 (EP);
F02M63/0225 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
F02F2007/0097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/21] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Saugdrosselpumpe | [2001/36] | English: | High pressure fuel injection pump | [2001/36] | French: | Pompe d'injection de carburant haute pression | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4184816 (BRETT HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 4, line 1 - line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1406435 (BRYCE BERGER LTD) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 2, line 9 - line 74; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR1068783 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1,3-8 * column 2 - column 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DD236775 (RENAK WERKE VEB [DD]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 10 *; | [AD]EP0863308 (WAERTSILAE NSD SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [AD] 1,7,8 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0863308 |