EP1136574 - Process for manufacturing embossing tools and their uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SM Schweizerische Munitionsunternehmung AG Allmendstrasse 74 3602 Thun / CH | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinhoff, Kurt Dr.-Ing. Grossgrund 22 6463 Bürglen / CH | 02 /
Schuleit, Natalie Dr.-Ing. Säntisstrasse 3 6207 Nottwil / CH | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810237.8 | 21.03.2000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136574 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/38, B21B27/00 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
B21B27/005 (EP);
C21D1/09 (EP);
C21D9/38 (EP);
B21B1/227 (EP);
B23K35/327 (EP);
F16C33/103 (EP);
F16C33/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung eines Prägwerkzeugs und dessen Anwendung | [2001/39] | English: | Process for manufacturing embossing tools and their uses | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication et utilisation d'outils de bosselage | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0230633 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0253366 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]); | [A]WO9205909 (HELL AG LINOTYPE [DE]); | [A]DE4211197 (ALLGAIER WERKE KG [DE]); | [A]BE901055 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE); | [A]JPH0489122 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920709), vol. 016, no. 314, Database accession no. (M - 1278), & JP04089122 A 19920323 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |