EP1039217 - Configuration of a lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Staufert, Gerhard Schulhausstrasse 8 4800 Zofingen / CH | [2000/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/39] | Application number, filing date | 00810245.1 | 22.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | CH19990000558 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: CH 55899 | [2000/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1039217 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
G02B6/0021 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02B6/0016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] |
Former [2001/24] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leuchtkörperaufbau | [2000/39] | English: | Configuration of a lighting device | [2000/39] | French: | Dispositif d'un corps d'éclairage | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | 16.05.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.05.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   07.06.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2002 | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE29617101U (WILLING GMBH DR ING [DE]) [DY] 1-5,9 * page 8; figures 1,2 *; | [DY]WO9802690 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [DY] 1-5,9 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0870978 (LI CHANGGU [CN]) [Y] 1-5,9 * abstract *; | [DA]US5876107 (PARKER JEFFERY R [US], et al) [DA] 8 * column 7 - column 8; figures 1-15 * |