EP1052314 - Sensor system for a ring spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20, Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Föhn, Sigisbert Zelgstrasse 47 8335 Hittnau / CH | 02 /
Gschliesser, Gerd Mattenbachstrasse 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2000/46] | Application number, filing date | 00810364.0 | 28.04.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | CH19990000852 | 06.05.1999 Original published format: CH 85299 | DE19991029467 | 26.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929467 | [2000/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052314 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052314 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/16 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
D01H1/162 (EP);
D01H13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | Sensorik für Ringspinnmaschine | [2000/46] | English: | Sensor system for a ring spinning machine | [2000/46] | French: | Système de déctection pour un métier à filer des anneaux | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
19.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Christian, et al, et al Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
19.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Christian, et al, et al Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
19.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE Opponent's representative Eder, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | 24.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.05.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.10.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/12] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 15.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0321/07 | 27.04.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.10.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | FR | 17.03.2004 | GB | 17.03.2004 | IE | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | AT | 28.04.2004 | LU | 28.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | ES | 28.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | BE | 30.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | IT | 28.04.2007 | [2009/41] |
Former [2008/03] | CY | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
PT | 17.08.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CY | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
FR | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
FR | 04.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 28.04.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
FR | 04.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
FR | 04.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 28.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09279426 ; | [Y]JPH0598522 ; | [XY]EP0480898 (BARCO AUTOMATION NV [BE]) [X] 1,5,6,12-19 * page 3, column 4, line 12 - line 24; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2-4,7-11; | [Y]EP0651079 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4,7,10 * page 2, column 2, line 10 - page 3, column 3, line 10; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 02, & JP09279426 A 19971028 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930817), vol. 017, no. 446, Database accession no. (C - 1098), & JP05098522 A 19930420 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8,9,11 * abstract * |