EP1050690 - Fastening device for insulating panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mischer, Stefan Kapfstrasse 378 9492 Eschen / LI | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 00810365.7 | 01.05.2000 | [2000/45] | Priority number, date | DE19991021151 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19921151 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1050690 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1050690 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050690 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/04 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
E04B1/7633 (EP,US);
E04F13/0835 (EP,US);
F16B13/00 (EP,US);
F16B43/00 (EP,US);
Y10S411/908 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/45] | F16B13/00, F16B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [2003/02] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für plattenförmige Isolationselemente | [2000/45] | English: | Fastening device for insulating panels | [2000/45] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour panneaux isolants | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 22.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3045986 (BOEHL A SCHRAUBEN KUNST [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6* figure 1; claims 1,5,7 *; | [A]EP0807722 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,3,4,6-8 * column 3, line 41 - line 48; figure 1; claims 1,2,5 * | by applicant | US5118235 |