EP1066907 - Saw blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blessing, Matthias Letzestrasse 1 6820 Frastanz / AT | 02 /
Fey, Michael Edlingerstrasse 68 83071 Stephanskirchen / DE | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 00810485.3 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | DE19991026881 | 12.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926881 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1066907 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1066907 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/12 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
B23D61/128 (EP);
B23D61/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/31] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sägeblatt | [2001/02] | English: | Saw blade | [2001/02] | French: | Lame de scie | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2015877 (THOMPSON VICTOR T) [X] 1,2,6,8 * page 1, column L, line 44 - column R, line 14 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,9,10 [Y] 4,7; | [YA]US4031793 (MIASKOFF LEONARD) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 5,10; | [YA]US3181577 (THOMAS GASKINS) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 31 - line 50 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]US134882 (F.H. HARDENBERG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06155401 ; | [A]US4016785 (TREFFNER CHARLES, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 29 * * figures 5,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940905), vol. 018, no. 474, Database accession no. (M - 1668), & JP06155401 A 19940603 (KISO POWER TOOL:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 4 * |