EP1085129 - Device for lubrication of the fixing means of the rails of a track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rossi, Piergiorgio Piazza Grande 55 6512 Giubiasco / CH | [2004/52] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Rossi, Piergiorgio Via del Mercato 4 6512 Giubiasco / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi, Via San Gottardo 15 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810811.0 | 08.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | CH19990001680 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: CH 168099 | [2001/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085129 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085129 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085129 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
E01B31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Schmieren der Schienenbefestigungsvorrichtungen eines Gleises | [2001/12] | English: | Device for lubrication of the fixing means of the rails of a track | [2001/12] | French: | Appareil pour la lubrification des moyens de fixation des rails d'une voie ferrée | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 12.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | BE | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | NL | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | SE | 26.04.2005 | ES | 07.05.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | CY | 08.09.2005 | GB | 08.09.2005 | IE | 08.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
CY | 08.09.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 08.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
GB | 08.09.2005 | ||
IE | 08.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
IE | 08.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
NL | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
BE | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 26.01.2005 | |
SE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1426325 (MONTMORENCY ATEL) [A] 7* page 2, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2051740 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US3680486 (PLASSER FRANZ, et al) [A] 5 * column 1, line 36 - line 47; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3709390 (CEMAFER GLEISBAUMASCHINEN UND [DE]) [A] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 24 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-3 * |