EP1086925 - Foil-cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zyliss AG Schachenweg 24 3250 Lyss / CH | [2003/21] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Zyliss Haushaltwaren AG Schachenweg 24 CH-3250 Lyss / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weibel, Hans Höheweg 41 3054 Schüpfen / CH | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 00810832.6 | 15.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | CH19990001748 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: CH 174899 | [2001/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086925 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B67B7/46 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B67B7/30 (EP);
B67B2007/0458 (EP);
B67B7/0452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | Kapselschneider | [2001/13] | English: | Foil-cutter | [2001/13] | French: | Coupe-capsule de bouchage | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 25.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4845844 (ALLEN HERBERT [US]) [DY] 1-3 * column 9, line 29 - column 10, line 15; figures 7,11 *; | [Y]DE29711041U (SIEGER GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 7, line 14 - line 21; figure 2 *; | [X]US5887305 (CELLINI FERDINANDO [IT]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 24 - line 27; figures 1-5B *; | [A]EP0573815 (CELLINI FERDINANDO [IT]) | by applicant | US4845844 | GB2322622 | EP0220850 |