EP1219556 - Method and device for the production of a printed product with printing unit, cutting unit and piling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurt, Gerhard Lindenweg 15 4852 Rothrist / CH | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Fenner, Werner Patentanwalt Hofacher 1 5425 Schneisingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Fenner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Hofacher 1 5425 Schneisingen / CH | Application number, filing date | 00811124.7 | 25.11.2000 | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219556 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219556 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/04 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
B65H83/02 (EP);
B65H29/041 (EP);
B65H2406/344 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Herstellung eines Druckerzeugnisses mit Druckwerk, Schneidwerk und Stapeleinheit | [2002/27] | English: | Method and device for the production of a printed product with printing unit, cutting unit and piling device | [2002/27] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la production d'un produit imprimé avec unité d' imprimerie, unité de coupage et dispositif à empiler | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2004 | ES | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | FR | 18.08.2004 | GB | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | IT | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | AT | 25.11.2004 | LU | 25.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 18.08.2004 | |
ES | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
FR | 18.08.2004 | ||
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
IT | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 25.11.2004 | ||
LU | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 18.08.2004 | |
ES | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
FR | 18.08.2004 | ||
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 25.11.2004 | ||
LU | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
FR | 18.08.2004 | ||
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
FR | 18.08.2004 | ||
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
AT | 25.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4666143 (REIST WALTER [CH]) [A] 1,15,37,38 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 10; figure - *; | [A]US4934687 (HAYDEN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1,15,37,38 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 21 * * column 10, line 57 - line 63; figure - * * column 11, line 14 - line 19; figure - *; | [A]US5288063 (LUNT REGINALD F J [US]) [A] 1,15,37,38 * column 3, line 20 - line 37 * * column 5, line 24 - line 31; figure - *; | [A]US5398919 (SUTER WALTER [CH]) [A] 1,15,37,38 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0672604 (STRALFORS AB [SE]) [A] 1,15,37,38* abstract *; | [A]US5772391 (SJOGREN CHRISTER A [US], et al) [A] 1,15,37,38 * column 5, line 23 - line 35; figure - * |