EP1215145 - Transport device with air cushion and method of operating such a transport device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states ABB RESEARCH LTD. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Wolfgang Bahnhofstrasse 65 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/25] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 00811171.8 | 11.12.2000 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1215145 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G51/03 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
B65G51/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [2003/11] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Transportvorrichtung mit einem Luftkissen sowie Verfahren zum Betrieb einer solchen Transportvorrichtung | [2002/25] | English: | Transport device with air cushion and method of operating such a transport device | [2002/25] | French: | Dispositif de transport avec coussin d'air et procédé de fonctionnement d'un tel dispositif de transport | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 02.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19917143 (DLR EV [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,8,10,12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4896610 | US3610695 | US4077507 | US3648852 |