EP1031795 - Modular hydraulic assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fontecal S.p.A. Via P. Pignatelli, 13, Fraz. Villanova 65012 Cepagatti Pescara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Fontecal S.p.A. Via P. Pignatelli, 13, Fraz. Villanova 65012 Cepagatti, Pescara / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tesolin, Luciano, Fontecal S.p.A. Via P. Pignatelli, 13 - Fraz. Villanova 65012 Cepagatti (PE) / IT | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830130.1 | 23.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | IT1999RM00128 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: IT RM990128 | [2000/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031795 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031795 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10, F24H9/14, F24D19/08, F24D3/08 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
F24D19/087 (EP);
F24D3/08 (EP);
F24D3/105 (EP);
F24H9/14 (EP);
F24H9/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/32] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modulare hydraulische Anordnung | [2000/35] | English: | Modular hydraulic assembly | [2000/35] | French: | Ensemble modulaire hydraulique | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.07.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5165596 (LE MER JOSEPH [FR]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 45 - line 52 * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 * * claims 1-9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2755752 (ARIES [FR]) [X] 1,2,9 * page 2 * * pages 15-16 * * claims 1-18 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP0052081 (FRICK ING SA [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 5 * * claims 1-9 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19705741 (BERNSTEIN HANS FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * claims 1-12 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DD202938 (ARTSCHWAGER HARTMUT, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |