EP1137162 - Analog/digital PWM control circuit of a winding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galbiati, Ezio Piazza Castello, 14 26020 Agnadello / IT | 02 /
Nessi, Maurizio Via Scalabrini, 11 22100 Como / IT | 03 /
Palestra, Marco Via Mozzoni, 6 24124 Bergamo / IT | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza Repubblica, 5 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830225.9 | 23.03.2000 | [2001/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1137162 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137162 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
H02M7/53873 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Analogdigitale Pulsbreitenmodulatorsteuerschaltung | [2001/39] | English: | Analog/digital PWM control circuit of a winding | [2001/39] | French: | Circuit de contrôle analogique-digital à modulation de largeur d'impulsions | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 27.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.02.2005 | DE | 01.10.2005 | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/18] | DE | 01.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5309079 (TAKADA KAZUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0892500 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0897213 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0760552 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * |