EP1157664 - Improved axial external fixator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHOFIX INTERNATIONAL B.V. Johannes Vermeerplein 11 1071 Amsterdam / NL | [2003/36] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states ORTHOFIX S.r.l. Via Delle Nazioni, 9 37012 Bussolengo (VR) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venturini, Daniele Via dei Carpini 36 37064 Povegliano Veronese (VR) / IT | 02 /
Coati, Michele Via A. Vivaldi 2 37029 San Pietro in Cariano (VR) / IT | 03 /
Rossi, Luigi Via Forte Laghetto 8 37019 Peschiera del Garda (VR) / IT | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830381.0 | 26.05.2000 | [2001/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157664 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157664 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/6458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Title | German: | Axialer äusserer Fixateur | [2001/48] | English: | Improved axial external fixator | [2001/48] | French: | Fixateur axial externe | [2001/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 26.05.2005 | IE | 26.05.2005 | LU | 26.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
IE | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
IE | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
IE | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
IE | 26.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | BE | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9402078 (ORTHOFIX SRL [IT]) [AD] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO9516402 (RICHARDSON JAMES BRUCE [GB]) [A] 1* figures 1,5 *; | [A]WO9703620 (HADASIT MED RES SERVICE [IL], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-8 * | by applicant | EP0609409 |