EP1080738 - Angioplasty stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.R.L. Via Crescentino 13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | [2004/51] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.p.A. Via Crescentino 13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vallana, Franco Via S. Massimo, 28 10123 Torino / IT | 02 /
Curcio, Maria Via Ponte Rocca, 31 13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | 03 /
Rolando, Giovanni Via Nino Costa, 40 10034 Chivasso (Torino) / IT | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2001/10] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830413.1 | 09.06.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00693 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: IT TO990693 | [2001/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080738 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1080738 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080738 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/16 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/38] |
Former [2001/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | ||
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stent für Angioplastie | [2001/10] | English: | Angioplasty stent | [2001/10] | French: | Stent pour angioplastie | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | BE | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 09.06.2005 | LU | 09.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 09.06.2005 | ||
LU | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 09.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
BE | 22.09.2004 | ||
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0441516 (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [X] 1-3,8-15,25-28,33-40,52,53 * figure - * * claim - *; | [A]WO9503356 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,7,25,29,31,32,52,53 * page 28, line 16 - line 28 * * claim - *; | [X]US5769883 (BUSCEMI PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-15,25-28,33-40,52,53 * column 12, line 38 - line 46 * * column 13, line 14 - column 14, line 8 * * claim - *; | [X]US5885609 (AMIJI MANSOOR M [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9,16,25-31,33,34,36,41,52,53 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 7 * * claims 1-13,16 *; | [X]WO9932167 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 1-13,16-18,22,24-38,41-43,47,49,51-53 * figure - * * claim - *; | [PX]EP0941740 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [PX] 1-6,8,9,16,25-31,33,34,36,41,52,53* claim - * | by applicant | US4952312 | EP0806190 | EP0847766 | EP0850604 | EP0857470 | EP0875215 | EP0895759 | EP0895760 |