EP1166800 - Pharmaceutical compositions containing antibiotics and fructan mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.S.D. BIO SCIENCE DEVELOPMENT SNC Di OMINI C. & ZUCCARI G. Piazza Cavour, 5 20060 Bussero (Milano) / IT | [2006/12] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states B.S.D. BIO SCIENCE DEVELOPMENT SNC Di OMINI C. & ZUCCARI G. Piazza Cavour, 5 20060 Bussero (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corradini, Claudio via S. Giovanna Elisabetta, 24 00189 Roma / IT | 02 /
Omini, Claudio Piazza Cavour, 5 20060 Bussero (MI) / IT | 03 /
Bonesso, Giampiero Avenue Crovetto Freres, 9 Monte Carlo / MC | 04 /
Tortora, Diomede via Acicastello, 32 95126 Catania / IT | 05 /
Pisani, Giorgio via Domenichino, 19 20100 Milano / IT | 06 /
Zuccari, Giuseppe via Europa, 25 26866 S. Angelo Lodig / IT | [2002/01] | Application number, filing date | 00830454.5 | 28.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166800 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166800 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/733, A61K31/702, A61K47/36, A61K47/26, A61K9/08 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP);
A61K31/424 (EP);
A61K31/43 (EP);
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K31/702 (EP);
A61K31/715 (EP);
A61K31/733 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/424, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/715, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/14] |
Former [2002/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen von Antibiotika und Fruktan-Gemische | [2002/01] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions containing antibiotics and fructan mixtures | [2002/01] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques contenant des antibiotiques et des mélanges de fructosane | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2006
08.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Tiense Suikerraffinaderij n.v. Tervurenlaan 182 1150 Brussel / BE Opponents representative Koster, Nico, et al, et al Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V. Patent Department Aandorenstraat 1 3300 Tienen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2006
08.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Tiense Suikerraffinaderij n.v. Tervurenlaan 182 1150 Brussel / BE Opponents representative Koster, Nico, et al, et al Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V. Patent Department Aandorenstraat 1 3300 Tienen / BE | ||
Former [2007/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2006
Tiense Suikerraffinaderij n.v. Tervurenlaan 182 1150 Brussel / BE Opponents representative Hermans, Johny, et al, et al Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V., Aandorenstraat 1 3300 Tienen / BE | 26.01.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/11] | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | 25.10.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.10.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   16.11.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2002 | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.2003 | 30.06.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2004 | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2006 | BE | 22.03.2006 | CH | 22.03.2006 | CY | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | FR | 22.03.2006 | IT | 22.03.2006 | LI | 22.03.2006 | NL | 22.03.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | SE | 22.06.2006 | DE | 23.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | GB | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | LU | 28.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | ES | 03.07.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
FR | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
LU | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
LU | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
FR | 09.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
GB | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
DE | 23.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
NL | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
CH | 22.03.2006 | ||
LI | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 22.03.2006 | |
LI | 22.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9631219 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph L * * page 11 - page 23 * * claims 1-3,6 *; | [AD]US5827526 (DOHNALEK MARGARET IONE HALPIN [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 35 - line 63 ** claim - *; | [X]WO0010582 (GANEDEN BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 7, line 4 - line 19 * * page 23, line 10 - page 25, line 2 * * page 30, line 13 - page 34, line 20; figure 4 * * claims 11,18,19,22-25,32,33,36-38 *; | [X] - GASKINS H R ET AL, "Dietary fructo-oligosaccharide modulates large intestinal inflammatory responses to Clostridium difficile in antibiotic-compromised mice.", MICROBIAL ECOLOGY IN HEALTH AND DISEASE, (1996), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 0891-060X, pages 157 - 166, XP000965229 [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 157 - page 158, column L, line 2 * * page 158, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1234-987X(199607)9:4<157::AID-MEH424>3.3.CO;2-M | [A] - BEERS MH AND BERKOW R (EDS.), The Merck Manual, 17th ed., ISBN: 0911910-10-7, MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, (1999), XP002153983 [A] 1-7 * page 293 - page 295 * | [ ] - Antibiotic-associated colitis [ ] * page 293 * |