EP1084672 - Dishwasher with device for drying by moist air discharge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMEG S.p.A. Via Circonvallazione Nord, 36 42016 Guastalla, RE / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Smeg S.p.A. Via Circonvallazione Nord, 36 42016 Guastalla, RE / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertazzoni, Roberto Via Maldotti 2 42016 Guastalla, RE / IT | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830591.4 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI01872 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: IT MI991872 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1084672 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1084672 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/48, A47L15/42 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
A47L15/488 (EP);
A47L15/486 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/12] | A47L15/48 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/02] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spülmaschine mit Vorrichtung zum trocknen mit Dampfluft | [2001/12] | English: | Dishwasher with device for drying by moist air discharge | [2001/12] | French: | Lave vaisselle avec dispositif de sèchage par extraction de l'air humide | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09299312 ; | [XA]JPH11104055 ; | [XA]DE1926049 (KRONWITTER WOLFRAM, et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, paragraphs 1,3,6 * * page 3 * * figure 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [A]WO9912464 (SPLIT VISION DEV AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-3* page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 29; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09299312 A 19971125 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-5,7 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11104055 A 19990420 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD;TOKYO GAS HOUSING KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0016]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0014] * [A] 3 |