EP1184953 - Electronic switching regulator circuit for producing a reference voltage variable with temperature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cocetta, Franco Via Fiore dei Liberi, 59 33040 Premariacco, Udine / IT | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830592.2 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/10] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1184953 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184953 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/22, G05F3/30, H02J7/14 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H02J7/14 (EP,US);
H02J7/007192 (US)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | H02J7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronische Schaltreglerschaltung zur Produktion einer Referenzspannung die sich mit der Temperatur verändert | [2002/10] | English: | Electronic switching regulator circuit for producing a reference voltage variable with temperature | [2002/10] | French: | Circuit électronique de régulateur à découpage produisant une tension de référence variable avec la température | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 09.05.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 08.02.2006 | |
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | DE | 09.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9100635 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 5 - page 6; figures 7-9 *; | [A]US5309083 (PIERRET JEAN-MARIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 7; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0751451 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]US5703476 (MERLO MAURO [IT], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, paragraph 1 * |