EP1118280 - Sole structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotto Sport Italia S.p.A. Via S. Gaetano 200 31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [2001/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomat, Andrea Via Belvedere, 5 31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion SpA Via G. Garibaldi 19 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via G. Garibaldi n. 19 37121 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 00830791.0 | 30.11.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | IT2000TV00002U | 21.01.2000 Original published format: IT TV200002 U | [2001/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118280 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118280 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118280 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/08 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A43B7/081 (EP,US);
A43B17/08 (EP,US);
A43B7/08 (EP,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | 02.04.2002 | LT | 02.04.2002 | LV | 02.04.2002 | MK | 02.04.2002 | RO | 02.04.2002 | SI | 02.04.2002 | Title | German: | Sohlenaufbau | [2001/30] | English: | Sole structure | [2001/30] | French: | Structure de semelle | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/48] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1034067 (HUTCHINSON CIE ETS) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5375345 (DJURIC ZORAN [CA]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5477626 (KWON JOONG T [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0001266 (KOREA INST FOOTWEAR & LEATHER [KR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |