EP1061141 - A method for total precipitation of valuable metals from an acid leaching solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boliden Mineral AB 936 81 Boliden / SE | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundkvist, Jan-Eric Läkarvägen 8b 931 41 Skelleftea / SE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Lundin, Björn-Eric Boliden Mineral AB, Patent & Trade Marks, P.O. Box 5001 194 61 Upplands Väsby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Boliden Mineral AB, Patent & Trade Marks, P.O. Box 5001 194 61 Upplands Väsby / SE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Boliden Mineral AB, Patent & Trade Marks, P.O. Box 21024 100 31 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00850099.3 | 15.06.2000 | [2000/51] | Priority number, date | SE19990002289 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: SE 9902289 | [2000/51] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061141 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/44, C22B19/20, C22B15/00, C22B23/00 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
C22B3/44 (EP,US);
C22B15/0089 (EP,US);
C22B19/26 (EP,US);
C22B23/0461 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum vollständigen Ausfällen von Wertmetallen aus einer sauren Laugelösung | [2000/51] | English: | A method for total precipitation of valuable metals from an acid leaching solution | [2000/51] | French: | Procédé de précipitation complète des métaux de valeur à partir d'une solution de lixiviation acide | [2000/51] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/51] | 20.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60159134 ; | [Y]FR2307043 (INT NICKEL CANADA [CA]) [Y] 1-6 * examples 2,3; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]BE894733 (CT BELGE D ETUDE ET DE DOCUMEN) [Y] 6* page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 4 *; | [Y]US4437953 (NEWMAN OLIVER M G [AU], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 13 - column 14; claim 4 *; | [XY]US4594102 (WEIR DONALD R [CA], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 9 - line 52; claims 4-6 * [Y] 6; | [Y]DD291346 (FUNK A BERGBAU HUETTENKOMBINAT [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * page 2 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 39, Database accession no. 1985-240838, XP002147356 & JPS60159134 A 19850820 (NIPPON PLATING KK) [Y] 6 * abstract * |