EP1169968 - Sealing and wound closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS AB Palmbladsgatan 10 754 50 Uppsala / SE | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akerfeldt, Dan Nyvla 755 92 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
Preiniz, Fredrik Körvelgatan 12A 754 48 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
Egnelöv, Per Nannas väg 6 754 40 Uppsala / SE | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Hytting, Kerstin Cecilia, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Hytting, Kerstin Cecilia, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 00850184.3 | 03.11.2000 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169968 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169968 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP);
A61B2017/00659 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abdichten und Verschliessen von Wunden | [2002/02] | English: | Sealing and wound closure device | [2002/02] | French: | Dispositif de scellage et occlusion pour blessures | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 03.04.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2002 | FI | 30.01.2002 | GR | 30.01.2002 | IT | 30.01.2002 | TR | 30.01.2002 | DK | 30.04.2002 | PT | 30.04.2002 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
FI | 30.01.2002 | ||
GR | 30.01.2002 | ||
TR | 30.01.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
FI | 30.01.2002 | ||
GR | 30.01.2002 | ||
DK | 30.04.2002 | ||
PT | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
FI | 30.01.2002 | ||
GR | 30.01.2002 | ||
PT | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 30.01.2002 | |
FI | 30.01.2002 | ||
PT | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 30.01.2002 | |
PT | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 30.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5531759 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 7, line 5 - column 9, line 18; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US5620461 (MUIJS VAN DE MOER WOUTER M [NL], et al) [A] 1,3,6-8 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 16; figures 4,6,9 *; | [A]WO9940849 (JUMP JEFFREY [CH], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8* abstract * | by applicant | US5342393 | US5350399 |