EP1142660 - Grooved refractory part used for metallurgical casting, assembly of refractory parts and casting installation comprising such assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE COMPANY Suite 200, Foulk Road 103 Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Vesuvius Crucible Company Suite 200, Foulk Road 103 Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renard, Jean-luc Rue Arthur Duquesne 27 7030 Saint-Symphorien / BE | 02 /
Borgosano, Luigi Rue du bout de la Haut 177 7390 Quaregnon / BE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Debled, Thierry Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Debled, Thierry Vesuvius Group S.A. Intellectual Property Department Rue de Douvrain, 17 7011 Ghlin / BE | Application number, filing date | 00870037.9 | 07.03.2000 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142660 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/42, B22D41/56, B22D41/58 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B22D41/56 (EP,US);
B22D41/42 (EP,US);
B22D41/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gerillter feuerfester Formkörper für metallurgischen Guss, Zusammensetzung feuerfester Formkörper und Gussvorrichtung der eine solche Zusammensetzung umfasst | [2001/41] | English: | Grooved refractory part used for metallurgical casting, assembly of refractory parts and casting installation comprising such assembly | [2001/41] | French: | Pièce réfractaire rainurée pour coulée métallurgique, assemblage de pièces réfractaires et installation de coulée comportant un tel assemblage | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH02235565 ; | [X]US3887117 (FEHLING HANS REINHARD) [X] 1-4,8-10* column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 17 *; | [X]US4576317 (WENGER OTTO [CH]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 13; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9220480 (INT IND ENG SA [BE]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 10; figures 4-6 *; | [Y]FR2757431 (VESUVIUS FRANCE SA [FR]) [Y] 11 * figure 1; claim 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901207), vol. 014, no. 552, Database accession no. (M - 1056), & JP02235565 A 19900918 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8,10 * abstract * [Y] 11 |