EP1106077 - Cow's milk and fodder for cows to obtain such a milk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dumoulin Parc Industriel 5300 Seilles / BE | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Interagri Dumoulin S.A. Parc Industriel 5300 Seilles / BE | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states Interagri 2001 S.A. Park Industriel 5300 Seilles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VanVolsem, Thibaut rue de l'Eglise 53 5380 Pontillas / BE | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 00870235.9 | 19.10.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | EP19990870256 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99870256 | [2001/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106077 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106077 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1106077 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/14, A23K1/18, A23C9/14, A23K1/00 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A23C9/20 (EP);
A23K40/25 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23C2230/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | LT | 15.10.2001 | LV | 15.10.2001 | RO | 15.10.2001 | SI | 15.10.2001 | Title | German: | Kuhmilch und Kuhfutter um eine solche Milch zu erhalten | [2001/24] | English: | Cow's milk and fodder for cows to obtain such a milk | [2001/24] | French: | Lait de vache et produit d'alimentation d'une vache pour obtenir un tel lait | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 11.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
05.04.2006
WITHDRAWN Valorex Rocade de l'Aumaillerie 35133 JAVENE / FR Opponent's representative Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | 02
15.07.2004
22.09.2006
WITHDRAWN Versele-Laga N.V. Kapellestraat 70 9800 Deinze / BE Opponent's representative De Clercq, Ann G. Y. De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
05.04.2006
WITHDRAWN Valorex Rocade de l'Aumaillerie 35133 JAVENE / FR Opponent's representative Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | ||
02
15.07.2004
22.09.2006
WITHDRAWN Versele-Laga N.V. Kapellestraat 70 9800 Deinze / BE Opponent's representative De Clercq, Ann G. Y. De Clercq, Brants & Partners c.v., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
Former [2006/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
05.04.2006
WITHDRAWN Valorex Rocade de l'Aumaillerie 35133 JAVENE / FR Opponent's representative Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | ||
02
15.07.2004
26.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Versele-Laga N.V. Kapellestraat 70 9800 Deinze / BE Opponent's representative De Clercq, Ann G. Y. De Clercq, Brants & Partners c.v., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
Former [2004/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
Valorex Rocade de l'Aumaillerie 35133 JAVENE / FR Opponent's representative Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | ||
02
15.07.2004
Versele-Laga N.V. Kapellestraat 70 9800 Deinze / BE Opponent's representative De Clercq, Ann De Clercq, Brants & Partners c.v., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
Former [2004/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
WITHDRAWN Valorex Rocade de l'Aumaillerie 35133 JAVENE / FR Opponent's representative Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | 19.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.04.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.08.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T1933/06 | 15.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.04.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2006/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2732560 (VALOREX SA [FR]) [X] 3 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]FR2768025 (UNICOPA [FR]) [X] 3-10 * page 5, lines 6-9 * * table 3 * * claims 1-4,6-8,12 *; | [X] - DHIMAN, T. R., ANAND, G. R., SATTER, L. D., AND PARIZA, M. W., "Conjugated Linoleic Acid Content of Milk from Cows Fed Different Diets", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (199910), vol. 82, pages 2146 - 2156, XP002136453 [X] 1,2 * page 2154; table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(99)75458-5 | [A] - ZEGARSKA, Z., AND KUZDZAL-SAVOIE, S., "Seasonal effects on the fatty acids content in milk fat", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT., VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN., DE, (1988), vol. 43, no. 12, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 777 - 779, XP002157645 [A] 1,2 * page 778, column 2, paragraphs 4-6 * * page 779, column 1, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * | Opposition | - FOCANT ET AL, ""The effect of vitamin E supplementation....", J.DAIRY SCI 81, (1998), pages 1095 - 1101 | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NUTRITITION SOCIETY ,58, ""Targets and procedures for altering ruminant....", DEMEYER AND DOREAU, (1999), pages 593 - 607 | - J.DAIRY SCI, 80, ""Performance and profiles milk fatty....", CHOUINARD ET AL, (1997), pages 334 - 342 | - ANN ZOOTECH 42, ""Influence de L'extrusion de mélanges de graines...", CLINQUART ET AL., (1993), pages 130 - 131 | - J.DAIRY SCI,76, ""Feed and animal facotrs influencing milk fat...", PALMQUIST ET AL, (1993), pages 1753 - 1771 | - J.DAIRY SCI.80, ""Potential to alter the content...", ASHES ET AL, (1997), pages 2204 - 2212 | - VAN KEMPEN AND JANSMAN, ""Recent advances in animal nutrition"", LOUGHBOROUGH , NOTTINGHAM UNIV. PRESS, LEICESTERSHIRE, UK, (1994), pages 31 - 56 | - ""nutrition changes milk composition"", STALLINGS, (1998), pages 404 - 232 | - J.OF NUTRITION, ""Dietary fatty acid sources affect....", KELLY ET AL, (1998), pages 881 - 885 | - VEERKAMP AND THOMPSON, ""A covariance function for feed intake...."", J.DAIRY SCI,82, (1999), pages 1565 - 1573 |