EP1071142 - Method of mounting leds on printed circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chip & Byte Datentechnik GmbH Jakob-Haringer-Strasse 3 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Peter Hackenbuch 65 5141 Moosdorf / AT | 02 /
Fischer, Markus Klostermühlstrasse 65 5282 Ranshofen / AT | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Mag. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00890226.4 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | AT19990001280 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: AT 128099 | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071142 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1071142 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, F21Y101/02, G08G1/095, H01L33/00, F21K7/00, // F21W111:00 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H05K3/305 (EP,US);
G08G1/095 (EP);
F21W2111/00 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP);
H05K2201/09018 (EP);
H05K2201/10106 (EP);
H05K2201/10651 (EP);
H05K2203/302 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/04] | H01L33/00, G08G1/095, F21K7/00, // F21W111:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/38] |
Former [2002/32] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestückung von Leiterplatten mit Leuchtdioden | [2001/04] | English: | Method of mounting leds on printed circuit boards | [2001/04] | French: | Procédé pour le montage de diodes électroluminescentes sur circuits imprimés | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.06.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | 28.06.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.06.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   18.07.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]DE19854899 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 6-9 * column 1, line 54 - line 61 * * column 2, line 3 - line 13 * * column 2, line 44 - line 52 * * column 3, line 3 - line 30 * * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]DE19752867 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6-10 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4774634 (TATE HOWARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 39 - line 60 * * column 3, line 36 - line 37 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 29 * * column 6, line 61 - line 67 * * column 7, line 11 - line 26 * * column 9, line 15 - line 31 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US5857767 (HOCHSTEIN PETER A [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 41 - line 45 * * column 5, line 16 - line 27 * * column 6, line 34 - line 40 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0921568 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 5, line 10 - line 28 * * column 5, line 46 - line 53 * * column 22, line 31 - column 23, line 6 * * figures 1,3,33,34 *; | [PA]EP0972677 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [PA] 1,6 * figures 1-3,24 * * column 6, line 23 - line 41 * * column 7, line 33 - line 39 * * column 7, line 4 - line 10 *; | [A]JPH10173121 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10173121 A 19980626 (PFU LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | US5896093 | US5785418 |