EP1152819 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FILLING OF VERTICAL TUBES WITH THE AID OF A PARTICULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalFinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states TotalFinaElf France Tour Total, 24, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATUREAUX, Thierry 10, rue des Frênes F-76290 Fontaine la Mallet / FR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00900671.9 | 27.01.2000 | [2001/46] | WO2000FR00182 | Priority number, date | FR19990000945 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900945 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044488 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152819 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152819 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/06, B65B1/06, B65G69/16 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B65B1/06 (EP);
B01J8/003 (EP);
B01J8/06 (EP);
B01J2208/00778 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERLEICHTERN DES BEFÜLLENS VERTIKALER ROHRE MIT HILFE EINES PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS | [2001/46] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FACILITATING THE FILLING OF VERTICAL TUBES WITH THE AID OF A PARTICULATE MATERIAL | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FACILITER LE REMPLISSAGE DE TUBES VERTICAUX A L'AIDE D'UN MATERIAU PARTICULAIRE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | CY | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | IE | 25.06.2003 | DK | 25.09.2003 | GR | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | SE | 25.09.2003 | ES | 22.12.2003 | CH | 31.01.2004 | LI | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
IE | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 25.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3562998 (EDWARDS TOMMY RAY) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [DX]US3608751 (HUNDTOFTE VIRGIL A) [DX] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2621447 (SALANOVE EDOUARD [FR]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0548999 (NORSK HYDRO TECHNOLOGY [NL]) [DA] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2762590 (COGEMA [FR]) [A] 6,10,13 * the whole document * |