EP1148231 - EGR COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | For all designated states Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJITA, Makoto Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGOME, Keiichi Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Katsuji Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Yoji Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 108-8, Sayamagahara, Iruma-shi Saitama 358-0032 / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [2001/43] | 01 /
TSUJITA, Makoto Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGOME, Keiichi Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | |||
03 /
INOUE, Katsuji Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hinodai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMASHITA, Yoji Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00900811.1 | 19.01.2000 | [2001/43] | WO2000JP00218 | Priority number, date | JP19990011776 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1177699 | JP19990158053 | 04.06.1999 Original published format: JP 15805399 | JP19990251546 | 06.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25154699 | [2001/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043663 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148231 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F28D7/16 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
F02M26/32 (EP);
F28D7/1653 (EP);
F28F1/405 (EP);
F28F1/42 (EP);
F28F1/426 (EP);
F28F13/12 (EP);
F28F9/02 (EP);
F28F9/0268 (EP);
F28F9/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLER FÜR ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNG | [2001/43] | English: | EGR COOLER | [2001/43] | French: | REFROIDISSEUR EGR | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2001 | Translation filed | 27.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH09310991 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [Y]JPS50153347 (HITACHI ZOSEM CORPORATION) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH10306995 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US3826304 (WITHERS J, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB330590 (WILLIAM HENRY OWEN) [A] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH09310991 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY); | [X]JPS50153347 ; | [X]JPH10318050 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY); | [Y]JPS5214258 (ALLIED CHEM); | [Y]JPS6015877B ; | [Y]JPS5222706B ; | [Y]JPH027418Y ; | [Y]JPH10259763 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]JPS57160590U ; | [A]JPH10281015 (CALSONIC CORP); | [A]US5785030 (PAAS NORBERT [US]); | [A]US5732688 (CHARLTON STEVE J [US], et al) |