EP1143994 - USE OF APOPTOSIS INDUCING AGENTS IN THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF (AUTO)IMMUNE DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/42] | USE OF APOPTOSIS INDUCING AGENTS IN THE TREATMENT OF (AUTO)IMMUNE DISEASES | ||
[2002/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leadd B.V. Wassenaarseweg 72 2333 AL Leiden / NL | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTEBORN, Mathieu, Hubertus, Maria Sternstraat 15 NL-2352 EH Leiderdorp / NL | 02 /
PIETERSEN, Alexandra, Maria Haarlemmerstraat 40A NL-2312 GB Leiden / NL | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00900970.5 | 10.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000NL00013 | Priority number, date | EP19990200056 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: EP 99200056 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0041497 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143994 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143994 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K48/00, G01N33/50, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/162 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | 08.08.2001 | LT | 08.08.2001 | LV | 08.08.2001 | MK | 08.08.2001 | RO | 08.08.2001 | SI | 08.08.2001 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON APOPTOSE-INDUZIERENDE MITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON (AUTO)IMMUNKRANKHEITEN | [2002/50] | English: | USE OF APOPTOSIS INDUCING AGENTS IN THE PREPARATION OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF (AUTO)IMMUNE DISEASES | [2002/50] | French: | UTILISATION D'AGENTS INDUISANT L'APOPTOSE, DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES (AUTO)IMMUNES | [2002/50] |
Former [2001/42] | VERWENDUNG VON APOPTOSE-INDUZIERENDE MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON (AUTO)IMMUNKRANKHEITEN | ||
Former [2001/42] | USE OF APOPTOSIS INDUCING AGENTS IN THE TREATMENT OF (AUTO)IMMUNE DISEASES | ||
Former [2001/42] | UTILISATION D'AGENTS INDUISANT L'APOPTOSE, DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES (AUTO)IMMUNES | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9641191 (AESCULAAP BV [NL]) [X] 2,5,11-14 * page 5, line 9 - page 9, line 21 * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]DE19704979 (MAX DELBRUECK CENTRUM [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 38 - line 44 ** example 1 *; | [XY]WO9837901 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12,14 * page 7, line 24 - page 9, line 10 * * page 11, line 5 - page 17, line 7 * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]EP0866131 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-12,14 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [DXY]WO9846760 (LEADD BV [NL], et al) [DX] 2,5,11-14 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [Y] 7,8; | [XAY] - "Apoptin specifically causes apoptosis in tumor cells and after UV-treatment in untransformed cells from cancer-prone individuals: a review.", MEDLINE, FILE SERVER STN KARLSRUHE, XP002107637 [X] 2,5,11-15 * abstract * [A] 16 [Y] 7,8 | [ ] - MUTATION RESEARCH, (1998 MAY 25) 400 (1-2) 447-55. REF: 52 JOURNAL CODE: NNA. ISSN: 0027-5107. |