EP1148849 - REHABITABLE LINKING SCREW FOR ARTHRODESIS OF A BONE JOINT FOR STABILISING TWO VERTEBRAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states AESCULAP AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Aesculap AG & Co. KG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMEIL, Marc 4 ter, rue des Coutures F-51100 Reims / FR | 02 /
HUPPERT, Jean 16, allée Châtaignère F-42580 l'Etrat / FR | 03 /
MARNAY, Thierry 290, rue Valérie Larbaud F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Eidelsberg, Olivier 20, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00901709.6 | 03.02.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000FR00252 | Priority number, date | FR19990001303 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9901303 | [2001/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0045752 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148849 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148849 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
A61F2/446 (EP);
A61B17/70 (EP);
A61F2/30965 (EP);
A61F2/442 (EP);
A61F2/4611 (EP);
A61F2002/2835 (EP);
A61F2002/30113 (EP);
A61F2002/30146 (EP);
A61F2002/3021 (EP);
A61F2002/30217 (EP);
A61F2002/30235 (EP);
A61F2002/30327 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30774 (EP);
A61F2002/30777 (EP);
A61F2002/30797 (EP);
A61F2002/3085 (EP);
A61F2230/0006 (EP);
A61F2230/0017 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
A61F2230/0069 (EP);
A61F2250/0039 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WIEDEREINWACHSBARE VERBINDUNGSSCHRAUBE ZUR ARTHRODESE EINES KNOCHENGELENKS, INSBESONDERE ZUR STABILISIERUNG ZWEIER WIRBEL | [2001/44] | English: | REHABITABLE LINKING SCREW FOR ARTHRODESIS OF A BONE JOINT FOR STABILISING TWO VERTEBRAE | [2001/44] | French: | VIS DE LIAISON REHABITABLE POUR L'ARTHRODESE D'UNE ARTICULATION OSSEUSE, NOTAMMENT POUR LA STABILISATION DE DEUX VERTEBRES | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDA]FR2766085 (CARLIER HERVE [FR]) [YD] 1-3,6,7,10,12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 8,11; | [Y]WO9802117 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10,12,14,15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0784967 (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2,8-10,15 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 7; figure - *; | [A]WO9525487 (PISHARODI MADHAVAN [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,10,12 * page 6, line 7 - line 10; figures 7-15 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 30 *; | [A]EP0637440 (ADVANCED TECHNICAL FABRICATION [FR]) [A] 1-3,5,11,16 * abstract *; | [A]US5609636 (KOHRS DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [DA]FR2736538 (GASTAMBIDE DANIEL [FR]) [DA] 2,5,7,10,15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9817209 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 13 * page 15, line 21; figures 6-8 *; | [DA]WO9214423 (MADHAVAN PISHARODI [US]) |