EP1069251 - METHOD OF INSTALLING CONDUIT OR THE LIKE ON MOUNTAIN SURFACE USING STEEL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fukui, Tomio 18-5, Kamiuma 4-chome Setagayaku Tokyo 154 / JP | [2006/15] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Fukui, Tomio 18-5, Kamiuma 4-chome, Setagaya-ku tokyo 154 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Piésold, Alexander J. Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00901967.0 | 28.01.2000 | [2001/03] | WO2000JP00458 | Priority number, date | WO1999JP00362 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: PCT/JP99/00362 | [2001/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044997 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069251 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1069251 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/00, F16L1/024 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
F16L1/024 (EP,US);
E03F3/02 (KR);
F16L1/00 (EP,US);
F16L1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | E03F3/02, E03B1/00, F16L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Extension states | AL | 27.10.2000 | LT | 27.10.2000 | LV | 27.10.2000 | MK | 27.10.2000 | RO | 27.10.2000 | SI | 27.10.2000 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR INSTALLATION EINER LEITUNG ODER ÄHNLICHEM AUF EINER GEBIRGSOBERFLÄCHE UNTER BENUTZUNG VON STAHLKABELN | [2001/03] | English: | METHOD OF INSTALLING CONDUIT OR THE LIKE ON MOUNTAIN SURFACE USING STEEL CABLE | [2001/03] | French: | PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION D'UN CONDUIT OU ANALOGUES SUR UNE SURFACE DE MONTAGNE AU MOYEN D'UN CABLE EN ACIER | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2000 | Translation filed | 27.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2006 | BE | 12.04.2006 | CH | 12.04.2006 | CY | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | LI | 12.04.2006 | NL | 12.04.2006 | DK | 12.07.2006 | SE | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | ES | 23.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
BE | 12.04.2006 | ||
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
CH | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
LI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 12.07.2006 | |
ES | 23.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08291880 (KITAGAWA HIROSHI); | [A]WO9817869 (FUKUI TOMIO [JP]) | Examination | JPS5326984 |