EP1152503 - ULTRASHORT PULSE LIGHT GENERATING METHOD USING RAMAN RESONATOR AND ITS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitakyushu Foundation for the Advancement of Industry, Science and Technology 2-1 Hibikino, Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 808-0135 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Kitakyushu Foundation for the Advancement of Industry, Science and Technology 2-1 Hibikino, Wakamatsu-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 808-0135 / JP | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Kitakyushu Technology Center Co., Ltd. 2-1, Nakabaru Shinmachi, Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 804-0003 / JP | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMASAKA, Totaro 10-30, Sakurazaka 2-chome, Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0024 / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902035.5 | 01.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000JP00535 | Priority number, date | JP19990024560 | 02.02.1999 Original published format: JP 2456099 | [2001/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046892 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152503 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/30, G02F1/35 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
H01S3/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG ULTRAKURZER PULSE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES RAMANRESONATORS UND DESSEN VORRICHTUNG | [2001/45] | English: | ULTRASHORT PULSE LIGHT GENERATING METHOD USING RAMAN RESONATOR AND ITS DEVICE | [2001/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE GENERATION DE LUMIERE A IMPULSIONS ULTRACOURTES UTILISANT UN RESONATEUR RAMAN ET SON DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2001 | Translation filed | 27.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 29.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4278902 (LOY MICHAEL M, et al) [X] 2-6 * abstract *; | [A]JP01082584 ; | [AD]JPH10133241 ; | [AD]JPH0621550 ; | [X] - HAENSCH T W, "A PROPOSED SUB-FEMTOSECOND PULSE SYNTHESIZER USING SEPARATE PHASE-LOCKED LASER OSCILLATORS", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19901201), vol. 80, no. 1, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 71 - 75, XP000165444 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(90)90509-R | [X] - SHIGETAKA YOSHIKAWA ET AL, "A NEW APPROACH FOR THE GENERATION OF ULTRASHORT OPTICAL PULSES", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930201), vol. 96, no. 1 / 2 / 3, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 94 - 98, XP000336733 [X] 2-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(93)90530-I | [X] - IMASAKA T ET AL, "Generation of multifrequency laser emission by injection of two-color beam into dye/Raman composite resonator", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS) JAPAN, (19920901), vol. 31, no. 9A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L1253 - L1254, XP002350530 [X] 2-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.L1253 | [X] - TOMOOKA T ET AL, "THE GENERATION OF POWERFUL RAINBOW-COLOR LASER EMISSION BY FOUR-WAVE RAMAN MIXING FOR DISPLAY AND ILLUMINATION", SHOMEI GAKKAI ZASSHI - JOURNAL OF THE ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING INSTITUTE OF JAPAN, SHOMEI GAKKAISHI, TOKYO, JP, (1998), vol. 22, no. 2, ISSN 0019-2341, pages 1 - 5, XP002928471 [X] 2-6 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890713), vol. 013, no. 307, Database accession no. (E - 787), & JP01082584 A 19890328 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) [A] 4 * abstract * | [A] - KAWANO H ET AL, "GENERATION OF HIGH-ORDER ROTATIONAL LINES IN HYDROGEN BY FOUR-WAVE RAMAN MIXING IN THE FEMTOSECOND REGIME", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199802), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 260 - 268, XP000737235 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.658704 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10133241 A 19980522 (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940422), vol. 018, no. 225, Database accession no. (E - 1541), & JP06021550 A 19940128 (SHIMADZU CORP) [AD] 1-6 * abstract * | [AD] - BRASSEUR J K ET AL, "CONTINUOUS-WAVE RAMAN LASER IN H2", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19980301), vol. 23, no. 5, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 367 - 369, XP000740630 [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * | [AD] - REPASKY K S ET AL, "PERFORMANCE AND DESIGN OF AN OFF-RESONANT CONTINUOUS-WAVE RAMAN LASER", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - B, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (199806), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0740-3224, pages 1667 - 1673, XP002928469 [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0621550 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A] - J.K. BRASSEUR ET AL., "Continuous-wave Raman laser in H2", OPTICS LETTERS,, (199803), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 367 - 369, XP002928468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.23.000367 | [A] - K.S. REPASKY ET AL., "Performance and design of an off-resonant continucus-wave raman laser", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B,, (199806), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1667 - 1673, XP002928469 | [A] - HIROYUKI KAWANO ET AL., "Generation of high-order rotational lines in hydrogen by four-wave raman mixing in the femtosecond regime", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS,, (199802), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 260 - 268, XP002928470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.658704 | [A] - TAKUYA TOMOOKA ET AL., "The generation of powerful rainbow-color laser emission by four-wave raman mixing for display and illumination", JOURNAL OF LIGHT & VISUAL ENVIRONMENT,, (1998), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 1 - 5, XP002928471 |