EP1143925 - TOPICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/42] | TOPICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING N-ACETYLALDOSAMINES OR N-ACETYLAMINO ACIDS | ||
[2005/05] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 655 Stump Road, Chalfont Pennsylvania 18914 / US | For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 655 Stump Road, Chalfont Pennsylvania 18914 / US | ||
For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | |||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 655 Stump Road, Chalfont Pennsylvania 18914 / US | ||
For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | |||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Yu, Ruey J., Dr. 4 Lindenwold Avenue Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | ||
For all designated states Van Scott, Eugene J., Dr. 3 Hidden Land Abington Pennsylvania 19001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902347.4 | 07.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000US00330 | Priority number, date | US19990227213 | 08.01.1999 Original published format: US 227213 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040217 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143925 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143925 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1143925 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7008 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/401 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/7008 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/447 (EP,US);
A61K8/4913 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q3/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/401, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/405, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2001/42] | A61K7/48, A61K7/075, A61K31/401, A61K31/198, A61K31/7008, A61K31/405, A61K9/06, A61P17/04, A61P17/10, A61P31/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT N-ACETYLGLUKOSAMIN | [2005/05] | English: | TOPICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING N-ACETYLGLUCOSAMINE | [2005/05] | French: | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE COMPRENANT DE LA N-ACETYL GLUCOSAMINE | [2005/05] |
Former [2001/42] | TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT N-ACETYLALDOSAMINEN ODER N-ACETYLAMINOSÄUREN | ||
Former [2001/42] | TOPICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING N-ACETYLALDOSAMINES OR N-ACETYLAMINO ACIDS | ||
Former [2001/42] | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE COMPRENANT DES ALDOSAMINES DE N-ACETYLE OU DES ACIDES AMINES DE N-ACETYLE | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04029094.2 / EP1570840 | EP05018302.9 / EP1639994 | EP09001844.1 / EP2080504 | EP10006974.9 / EP2311452 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | 03.07.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.04.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.12.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS56155298 ; | [X]JPS5679618 ; | [X]JPS61210013 ; | [X]JPH09323915 ; | [X]FR2244541 (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 3 * * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 21 * * page 5, line 12 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 31 - page 6, line 35 *; | [X]DE3435842 (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 9 - page 1, line 15 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 21 *; | [X]EP0328099 (ESTEE LAUDER INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 29 - page 2, line 31 * * Example *; | [X]EP0440298 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 46; examples 1-11 * * particularly Example 9 *; | [X]US5112613 (HONDA SHINKICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 50 - column 1, line 57 * * column 3, line 10 - column 3, line 15; examples 1-6 *; | [X]US5451405 (ZHANG KELLY H [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 30 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 24 - column 3, line 30 * * column 7, line 57 - column 7, line 64 * * examples 3-7 *; | [X]US5468476 (AHLUWALIA GURPREET S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 43 - column 1, line 53 *; | [X]US5472698 (RAWLINGS ANTHONY V [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 34 * * column 2, line 51 - column 2, line 55 * * column 7, line 25 - column 7, line 31; examples 13-18 *; | [X]US5652273 (HENRY JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 17 *; | [X]US5733535 (HOLLINGSHEAD JUDITH ANN [US], et al) [X] 1-20* column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 29; examples I-IX *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 01, Database accession no. 1982-00887E, XP002138486 & JPS56155298 A 19811201 (MILBON KK) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 33, Database accession no. 1981-59656D, XP002138487 & JPS5679618 A 19810630 (AMOROS KK) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 44, Database accession no. 1986-287932, XP002138488 & JPS61210013 A 19860918 (IWASE COSFA CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 09, Database accession no. 1998-095650, XP002138489 & JPH09323915 A 19971216 (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [X] 1-20 * abstract * | Examination | JPS5913708 | JPH08143588 | US4772591 | EP0852946 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840509), vol. 0080, no. 98, Database accession no. (C - 221), & JP59013708 A 19840124 (SHISHEIDO KK) | - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-318952, & JPH08143588 A 19960604 (KOSE KK) |